Ohio Security Insurance Co. v Certain Goods, LLC
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Defendant: Certain Goods LLC and Certain Goods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00098
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 4/17/2019 at 3:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 4/12/2019 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 4/12/2019. (jy)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Certain Goods, LLC. (Abel, Kirstin)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Defendant's Answer or responsive pleading is due by 3/13/2019. (jy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Kirstin L. Abel . Filed by Certain Goods, LLC. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Abel, Kirstin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to Complaint, #1 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Certain Goods, LLC. (Abel, Kirstin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Certain Goods, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/24/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jtj)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5709046 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ohio Security Insurance Co. against Certain Goods LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Pierson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Co. v Certain Goods, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Co.
Represented By: William E. Pierson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Goods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Goods, LLC
Represented By: Kirstin L. Abel
Represented By: Jamie T. Azevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?