Pomegranate Communications, Inc. v. Sourcebooks, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pomegranate Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Sourcebooks, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00119
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Elizabeth A. McNamara (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: eamcnamara. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth A. McNamara for Sourcebooks, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5748114 issued. Signed on 2/26/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth A. McNamara . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5748114. Filed by Sourcebooks, Inc.. (Cunningham, Timothy)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Sourcebooks, Inc. waiver sent on 2/5/2019. Filed by Pomegranate Communications, Inc.. (Beach, Eric)
January 25, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper. (sss)
January 25, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sourcebooks, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 5/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/24/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/24/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sss)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Pomegranate Communications, Inc.. (Beach, Eric)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (Trademark Infringement) Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5713752 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 2,160,660--5/26/1998--Pomegranate Communications, Inc.. Filed by Pomegranate Communications, Inc. against Sourcebooks, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Beach, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomegranate Communications, Inc. v. Sourcebooks, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pomegranate Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Eric C. Beach
Represented By: Jon P. Stride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sourcebooks, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy M. Cunningham
Represented By: Elizabeth A. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?