Peninsula Plumbing, Inc. v. Rheem Manufacturing Company et al
Plaintiff: PENINSULA PLUMBING, INC. and Peninsula Plumbing, Inc
Defendant: Keller Supply Company, Rheem Manufacturing Company, Keller Supply Co. and Keller Plumbing Supply Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00122
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 7 Demand for Jury Trial by Keller Plumbing Supply Co., Rheem Manufacturing Company . Filed by Keller Plumbing Supply Co., Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Daywitt, Jason)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Monday 5/20/2019 at 9:30AM. The court will provide the parties with the court's conference line call-in information by separate sealed entry. (peg)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Keller Plumbing Supply Co.. (Attachments: #1 Keller Corporate Disclosure) (Daywitt, Jason)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Daywitt, Jason)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 5/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/27/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 6/27/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (joha)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Daywitt, Jason)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV57274 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5714470 . Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (State Court Pleadings), #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Daywitt, Jason) Modified to correct text and include amount paid on 1/25/2019 (sss).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peninsula Plumbing, Inc. v. Rheem Manufacturing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENINSULA PLUMBING, INC.
Represented By: Hafez Daraee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peninsula Plumbing, Inc
Represented By: Hafez Daraee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Supply Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Jason H. Daywitt
Represented By: Rachel T. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Plumbing Supply Co.
Represented By: Rachel T. Reynolds
Represented By: Jason H. Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?