Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. v. Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.
Defendant: John Doe, 2, John Doe, 3, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Ventex Co., Ltd., John Doe, John Doe, 4, Kyung-Chan Go, Robert Murphy, Man-Sik (Paul) Park, Michael J. Carey, John Doe, 5, Wendy M. Carey, John Doe 3, John Doe 2, Robert (Bob) Murphy, John Doe 5, John Doe 4 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2019cv00137
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Referring Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 53 Declaration of Erin Forbes in Support of Columbia's Motion to Strike. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike, #52 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Aldrich, Nicholas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 52 Motion to Strike or in the Alternative, to File an Over-Length Response Brief Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits #45 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 48 Response in Opposition to Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s to Motion to File Documents Under Seal #31 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 47 Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Ruling on Columbia's Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #46 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L) (Aldrich, Nicholas)
March 28, 2019 Filing 46 Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay Ruling on Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.s Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time #29 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
March 27, 2019 Filing 51 Declaration of Scott DeNike in Support of Defendant's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL). (sb) (Filed Under Seal Per Order #42 ).
March 27, 2019 Filing 50 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re Seirus' Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL). Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (sb) (Filed Under Seal Per Order #42 ).
March 27, 2019 Filing 49 Exhibits M, P, S, T, and U re: Declaration of Seth M. Sproul #44 . (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit U) (Filed Under Seal Per Order #42 ). Modified on 3/28/2019 to add Docket Text (sb).
March 27, 2019 Filing 45 Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
March 25, 2019 Filing 44 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #43 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Sproul, Seth)
March 25, 2019 Filing 43 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order #6 . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re: Seirus' Motion to Seal Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits (ECF #40 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 3/25/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 22, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re Seirus' Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #40 .) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 22, 2019 Filing 40 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re Seirus' Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 22, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Defendant's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #37 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 22, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Scott DeNike in Support of Defendant's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #37 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 22, 2019 Filing 37 Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Tucker N. Terhufen (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tnterhufen. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tucker N. Terhufen for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5779919 issued. Signed on 3/20/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
March 19, 2019 Filing 34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tucker N. Terhufen . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5779919. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
March 14, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #31 .) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 14, 2019 Filing 32 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - Granting Motion to File Under Seal. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
March 14, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
March 14, 2019 Filing 30 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay, #29 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rothauge, Renee)
March 14, 2019 Filing 29 Motion for Stay Ruling on Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.s Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, and Robert (Bob) Murphy's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #27 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 4/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
March 11, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint #26 . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee)
February 28, 2019 Filing 26 First Amended Complaint for Fraud, Racketeering, Abuse of Process, and Civil Conspiracy. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against All Defendants. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding the Affidavits of Service (#'s #21 , #22 , #23 , & #24 ) filed on 2/20/19. The service date entered in these entries at filing were incorrect. The service date was 2/19/19, not 2/20/19. The Clerk's Office has modified the docket text of these entries to reflect the correct service date. (eo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Robert (Bob) Murphy served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Wendy M. Carey served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Michael J. Carey served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo)
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Order - Any Defendant who files an appearance in this case shall also file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Protective Order (ECF #6 ) within 14 days of their appearance. Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr, David W. Axelrod, and Erin Forbes present as counsel for Plaintiff. Christopher S. Marchese, Oliver J. Richards, Seth M. Sproul, and Renee Rothauge present as counsel for Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., by Special Appearance. Scott DeNike Present as outside counsel for Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Oliver J. Ricahrds (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ojrichards. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Oliver J. Richards for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-573806 issued. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Seth M. Sproul (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: smsproul. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Seth M. Sproul for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5738054 issued. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. Marchese for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5738021 issued. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #10 Attorney Appearance, #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. At the time of docketing the individual defendants, Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert (Bob) Murphy), were selected as filers and represented by Ms. Rothauge. Ms. Rothauge only represents defendant Serius Innovative Accessories. The docket text and the attached PDF documents are corrected to reflect the correct filers and representation. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Oliver J. Richards . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5738065. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). Modified on 2/14/2019 to remove names of individual defendants who are not related to this filing (cw).
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Seth M. Sproul . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5738054. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). Modified on 2/14/2019 to remove names of individual defendants who are not related to this filing (cw).
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Marchese . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5738021. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). Modified on 2/14/2019 to remove names of individual defendants who are not related to this filing (cw).
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Renee E. Rothauge appearing on behalf of Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) Modified on 2/14/2019 to correct representation by removing individual defendants (cw). (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw).
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Entry of Order Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - Setting a Telephone Status Conference for 2/14/2019 at 01:30PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Motion for an Interim Protective Order. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Aldrich, Nicholas)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Aldrich, Nicholas)
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Kyung-Chan Go, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Man-Sik (Paul) Park, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Ventex Co., Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. for Fraud, Racketeering, Abuse of Process and Civil Conspiracy Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5718143 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons Proposed Summonses). (Aldrich, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. v. Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Christopher S. Marchese
Represented By: Tucker N. Terhufen
Represented By: Seth M. Sproul
Represented By: Oliver J. Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventex Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyung-Chan Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man-Sik (Paul) Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy M. Carey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (Bob) Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Represented By: David W. Axelrod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?