Chaffin v. Apple, Inc.

Plaintiff: Scott Chaffin
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00155
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) #8 . Filed by All Defendants. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
March 8, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of William J. Macke . Filed by Scott Chaffin. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #10 .) (Macke, William)
March 8, 2019 Filing 10 Response to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6) #8 . Filed by Scott Chaffin. (Macke, William)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of April Upchurch Fredrickson in Support of Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #8 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendant Apple Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(B)(6). Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #5 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 2/22/2019. Ordered on 2/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of April Upchurch Fredrickson in Support of Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #5 .) (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/1/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/1/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Apple, Inc.. (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV57505 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5723456 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Apple, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1). (Upchurch Fredrickson, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaffin v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Chaffin
Represented By: William J. Macke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Copple
Represented By: April L. Upchurch Fredrickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?