Yoshida Group, LLC v. Adams et al
Plaintiff: Yoshida Group, LLC
Defendant: Sand In The City, LLC and Bert Adams
Case Number: 3:2019cv00171
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time #10 as follows: Answer to amended complaint deadline reset to 5/6/2019 for all defendants. (gm)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Bert Adams, Sand In The City, LLC. (Ford, Susan)
March 25, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Susan L. Ford appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Ford, Susan)
February 5, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Complaint . Filed by Yoshida Group, LLC against Bert Adams, Sand In The City, LLC. (Nelson, Phil)
February 5, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bert Adams, Sand In The City, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: #1 issued summons Sand in the City) (ecp)
February 5, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to Title 15 Section 1116(c), which states that it shall be the duty of the clerks of such courts within one month after the filing of any action give notice thereof in writing to the Director setting forth in order so far as known the names and addresses of the litigants and the designating number or numbers of the registration or registrations upon which the action, suit, or proceeding has been brought, and in the event any other registration be subsequently included in the action, suit, or proceeding by amendment, answer, or other pleading, the clerk shall give like notice thereof to the Director, and within one month after the judgment is entered or an appeal is taken the clerk of the court shall give notice thereof to the Director, and it shall be the duty of the Director on receipt of such notice forthwith to endorse the same upon the file wrapper of the said registration or registrations and to incorporate the same as a part of the contents of said file wrapper.. (ecp)
February 5, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Yoshida Group, LLC. (Nelson, Phil)
February 5, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons of Sand in the City, LLC Filed by Yoshida Group, LLC. (Nelson, Phil)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons of Bert Adams Filed by Yoshida Group, LLC. (Nelson, Phil)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/5/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/5/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5726263 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Yoshida Group, LLC against Yoshida Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Nelson, Phil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoshida Group, LLC v. Adams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand In The City, LLC
Represented By: Susan L. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Adams
Represented By: Susan L. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yoshida Group, LLC
Represented By: Keith A. Pitt
Represented By: Phil J. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?