Educational Credit Management Corporation v. William Ghiorso
Plaintiff: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Defendant: William Ghiorso dba Ghiorso Law Offices and William Ghiorso
Case Number: 3:2019cv00198
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Bugbee, Daniel)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to William Ghiorso. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/12/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/12/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/12/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jtj)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Bugbee, Daniel)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5731857 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Bugbee, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Educational Credit Management Corporation v. William Ghiorso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ghiorso dba Ghiorso Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Ghiorso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Bugbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?