Lexington Insurance Company and Metro v. InSinkErator
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company and Metro
Defendant: InSinkErator
Case Number: 3:2019cv00250
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 Reply of Defendant in Support to Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 Oral Argument requested. Filed by InSinkErator. (Lyon, Wendy)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 Exhibit D to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #8 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson) Modified on 3/18/2019 (ecp)to correct docket text.
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #8 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct docket text(ecp).
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #8 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct docket text(ecp).
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #8 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 ORAL ARGUMENT requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson) Modified on 3/18/2019 to correct docket text (ecp).
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit in Opposition (Declaration) to Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #4 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Carson O. Smith appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Carson)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Defendant's motion to dismiss #4 will be taken under advisement by the court as of 5/24/2019; the request for oral argument will be considered in due course. (peg)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Wendy E. Lyon in Support of Motion to Dismiss. Filed by InSinkErator. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Lyon Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Lyon Declaration) (Lyon, Wendy)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to Dismiss Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Oral Argument requested. Filed by InSinkErator. (Lyon, Wendy)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/20/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 7/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by InSinkErator. (Lyon, Wendy)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV51669 from Circuit Court, Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5743208 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by InSinkErator (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State court Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State court Amended Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lyon, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company and Metro v. InSinkErator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company and Metro
Represented By: Waylon J. Pickett
Represented By: Carson O. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InSinkErator
Represented By: Wendy E. Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?