Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co

Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund and Operating Engineers Pension Fund
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Case Number: 3:2019cv00718
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DEFAULT - (Granting Motion for Entry of Default #5 ). Signed on 6/24/19 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Noelle E. Dwarzski in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Default. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Pension Fund. (Related document(s): Motion for default, #5 .) (Dwarzski, Noelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Dwarzski, Noelle)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Affidavit of Service upon Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co served on 5/21/2019 Filed by Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund; International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund; Operating Engineers Pension Fund. (Dwarzski, Noelle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jtj)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5844015 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund, International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund, Operating Engineers Pension Fund against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Dwarzski, Noelle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the AGC-Operating Engineer Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Operating Engineers Local 701-AGC Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Pension Fund
Represented By: Noelle E. Dwarzski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?