Lopez Chavez et al v. All Oregon Landscaping, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Raul Gomez and Martin Lopez Chavez
Defendant: Tony Prunty, All Oregon Landscaping, Inc. and Craig Prunty
Case Number: 3:2019cv00719
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order: SETTING a Settlement Conference for Thursday, 7/25/2019, at 09:00AM at the U.S. Courthouse, 1000 SW Third Avenue, Room 740 (Clerk's Office - Intake Desk), Portland, Oregon, before Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Janice M. Stewart. (pvh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Hafez Daraee appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Daraee, Hafez)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service of Affidavit of Service #6 , Affidavit of Service #7 upon Tony Prunty served on 5/10/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kuranz, Quinn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Affidavit of Service #6 upon Craig Prunty served on 5/10/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kuranz, Quinn)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 Affidavit of Service upon All Oregon Landscaping, Inc. served on 5/10/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kuranz, Quinn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Oregon Landscaping, Inc., Craig Prunty, Tony Prunty. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/7/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/7/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (sss)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to Join Law Suit . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kuranz, Quinn)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Consent to Join Law Suit . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kuranz, Quinn)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5844152 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Martin Lopez Chavez against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Kuranz, Quinn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez Chavez et al v. All Oregon Landscaping, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Prunty
Represented By: Hafez Daraee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Oregon Landscaping, Inc.
Represented By: Hafez Daraee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Prunty
Represented By: Hafez Daraee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raul Gomez
Represented By: Quinn E. Kuranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Lopez Chavez
Represented By: Quinn E. Kuranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?