Camarata v. Portland Community College et al
Plaintiff: Gene Camarata
Defendant: Lisa Avery, John Does 1-5, Garrett Cimino, Mark Mitsui, Portland Community College, Heather Lang and Jeff Fishback
Case Number: 3:2019cv00738
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. Order - At the Plaintiff's unopposed request, the deadline for Plaintiff's response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF #9 ) is due by 7/26/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/3/2019.) (mja)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Substitute Defendant. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Elliott, Cody)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint #7 . Response is due by 6/14/2019. Ordered by Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 5/16/2019.) (jp)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Elliott, Cody)
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Gene Camarata regarding Case Reassignment Notice #5 . (eo)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by All Defendants. (Elliott, Cody)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Removal to Plaintiff Filed by All Defendants. (Elliott, Cody)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/10/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jtj)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV06800 from Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5846835 issued.. Filed by Garrett Cimino, Mark Mitsui, Jeff Fishback, Portland Community College, John Does 1-5, Lisa Avery, Heather Lang. (Elliott, Cody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camarata v. Portland Community College et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Avery
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garrett Cimino
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Mitsui
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portland Community College
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather Lang
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Fishback
Represented By: Cody J. Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Camarata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?