Wix v. Chugach Education Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Meredith Wix
Defendant: Robert Wright, Naomi Ulsted, Management & Training Corporation, Danny Stoddard, Micah Wiese and Chugach Education Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00754
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 19 Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #15 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Meredith Wix. (Le Roux, Daniel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 Declaration of Peder Rigsby in Opposition to Motion to Remand. Filed by Chugach Education Services, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #17 .) (Rigsby, Peder)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to State Court #15 . Filed by Chugach Education Services, Inc.. (Rigsby, Peder)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 Declaration of Daniel K. Le Roux in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Filed by Meredith Wix. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #15 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (LeRoux, Daniel)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Meredith Wix. (LeRoux, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Management & Training Corporation. (Moses, Daniel)
June 7, 2019 Filing 13 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Management & Training Corporation, Danny Stoddard. (Moses, Daniel)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 . Filed by Naomi Ulsted, Chugach Education Services, Inc.. (Rigsby, Peder)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Chugach Education Services, Inc.. (Rigsby, Peder)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Micah Wiese. (Hawk, Christopher)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #7 ). The deadline for defendants Management & Training Corporation and Danny Stoddard to file an Answer or other responsive pleading is extended to 6/7/2019. Ordered on 5/17/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Daniel J. Moses . Filed by Management & Training Corporation, Danny Stoddard. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #7 .) (Moses, Daniel)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Notice of Removal, #1 . Filed by Management & Training Corporation, Danny Stoddard. (Moses, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 6/3/2019. Ordered on 5/16/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Peder Rigsby . Filed by Chugach Education Services, Inc., Naomi Ulsted. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Rigsby, Peder)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Naomi Ulsted, Chugach Education Services, Inc.. (Rigsby, Peder)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 9/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/11/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sb)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sb)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV15416 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5848943 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Chugach Education Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Rigsby, Peder)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wix v. Chugach Education Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Ulsted
Represented By: Matthew C. Casey
Represented By: Peder A. Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management & Training Corporation
Represented By: Daniel J. Moses
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Stoddard
Represented By: Daniel J. Moses
Represented By: Mark A. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Micah Wiese
Represented By: Christopher E. Hawk
Represented By: Brian J. Kernan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chugach Education Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew C. Casey
Represented By: Peder A. Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meredith Wix
Represented By: Daniel K. Le Roux
Represented By: Mitra T. Shahri
Represented By: Andrew Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?