United States of America v. Ponta et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Oregon Department of Revenue, Erlinda M. Fazio, Clackamas County, Yvonne Rivelli Ponta, Quick Collect, Inc., Carlo Ponta and Richard G. Fazio
Case Number: 3:2019cv00757
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 26 Joint Stipulation LIEN PRIORITY BETWEEN THE UNITED STATES, RICHARD G. FAZIO, ERLINDA M. FAZIO, AND THE OREGON DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE by United States of America. Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
July 9, 2019 Filing 25 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yael Bortnick) (Bortnick, Yael)
July 3, 2019 Filing 24 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Yvonne Rivelli Ponta. (jn)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - Defendants Yvonne Rivelli Ponta and Carlo Ponta's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #18 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 7/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. Copy mailed to Defendants on 7/1/2019. (mja)
June 28, 2019 Filing 22 Response to Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint,, #1 #18 . Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 21 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 27, 2019 Filing 20 Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 19 Joint Status Report . Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 27, 2019 Filing 18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Filed by Yvonne Rivelli Ponta, Carlo Ponta. (jn)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 Answer to #1 Complaint,, . Filed by Oregon Department of Revenue. (Na, Belle)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Service upon Clackamas County served on 5/20/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 Affidavit of Service upon Oregon Department of Revenue served on 5/23/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 Affidavit of Service upon Erlinda M. Fazio served on 5/19/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service upon Richard G. Fazio served on 5/19/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service upon Quick Collect, Inc. served on 5/21/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 Affidavit of Service upon Yvonne Rivelli Ponta served on 5/17/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 Affidavit of Service upon Carlo Ponta served on 6/7/2019 Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint,, , Counterclaim United States of America. Filed by Erlinda M. Fazio, Richard G. Fazio. (Schlotfeldt, Albert)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 Joint Stipulation to Lien Priority Between the United States and Clackamas County. Signed on 5/23/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Stipulation to Lien Priority between the United States and Clackamas County by United States of America. Filed by United States of America. (Bortnick, Yael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance of Albert F. Schlotfeldt appearing on behalf of Erlinda M. Fazio, Richard G. Fazio Filed by on behalf of Erlinda M. Fazio, Richard G. Fazio. (Schlotfeldt, Albert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/11/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 10/11/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jn)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by United States of America against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons to Carlo Ponta, #3 Proposed Summons to Yvonne Rivelli Ponta, #4 Proposed Summons to Quick Collect, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons to Richard G. Fazio, #6 Proposed Summons to Erlinda M. Fazio, #7 Proposed Summons to Oregon Department of Revenue, #8 Proposed Summons Clackamas County). (Bortnick, Yael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ponta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon Department of Revenue
Represented By: Belle S. Na
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erlinda M. Fazio
Represented By: Albert F. Schlotfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clackamas County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yvonne Rivelli Ponta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quick Collect, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlo Ponta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard G. Fazio
Represented By: Albert F. Schlotfeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yael Bortnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?