Vendegna v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Renee M. Vendegna
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration and Commissioner Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00773
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance of Stephen F. Dmetruk, Jr appearing on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration Filed by on behalf of Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Dmetruk, Stephen)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Commissioner Social Security Administration served on 6/4/2019, answer due on 10/2/2019. Service specifically made upon Local U.S. Attorney, Regional Counsel or Agency, and the U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Return for Regional Counsel or Agency, #2 USM 285 Return for U.S. Attorney General) (joha)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Issued Summons as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service.) (ljc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to Commissioner Social Security Administration. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF No. #2 ). Signed on 5/17/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Social Security Procedural Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (joha)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP . Filed by Renee M. Vendegna. (Stolzberg, Karen)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint to Review Final Decision of Commissioner (In forma pauperis status selected). Filed by Renee M. Vendegna against Commissioner, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Stolzberg, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vendegna v. Commissioner Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee M. Vendegna
Represented By: Karen Stolzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stephen F. Dmetruk, Jr.
Represented By: Renata Gowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?