Carlson v. Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Ken W. Carlson
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00861
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 8/15/2019 at 3:00 PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 8/12/2019 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 8/12/2019. (jy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 13 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Shelley R. Hebert (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: srhebert. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (sss)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Shelly R. Hebert for Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5918034 issued. Signed on 7/12/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Ian H. Morrison (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ihmorrison. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to reset your password if needed. (sss)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ian H. Morrison for Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5918020 issued. Signed on 7/12/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Shelley R. Hebert . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5918034. Filed by Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Moses, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ian H. Morrison . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5918020. Filed by Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Moses, Andrew)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to #1 Complaint, . Filed by Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Moses, Andrew)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #4 . Defendant's Answer is due by 7/11/2019. (jy)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Moses, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Present Other Defenses or Objections to Plaintiff's Complaint Complaint, #1 . Filed by Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. (Moses, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Prudential Life Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/2/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/1/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/1/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5876229 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Ken W. Carlson against The Prudential Life Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Glor, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carlson v. Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Shelly R. Hebert
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Represented By: Andrew S. Moses
Represented By: Elaine J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken W. Carlson
Represented By: Megan E. Glor
Represented By: John C. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?