Sentry Marine Towing Ltd. v. Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00921
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Spivak, Svetlana)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Motion for Entry of Default #6 . Signed on 8/5/2019 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Svetlana P. Spivak In Support of Motion for Default. Filed by Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.. (Related document(s): Motion for default #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Spivak, Svetlana)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Entry of Default . Filed by Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Spivak, Svetlana)
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #3 upon Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. served on 7/3/2019 with Complaint, Exhibit A, Civil Cover Sheet and Civil Case Assignment Order Filed by Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.. (Spivak, Svetlana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.. (Spivak, Svetlana)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/12/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/12/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (ecp)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5887587 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Sentry Marine Towing Ltd. against Triple A Machine Shop, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Spivak, Svetlana) Modified on 6/13/2019 to update payment information (ecp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentry Marine Towing Ltd. v. Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Marine Towing Ltd.
Represented By: Svetlana P. Spivak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?