Poulson v. US Government et al

Petitioner: Kermit Ty Poulson
Respondent: US Government and Captain Alexander
Case Number: 3:2019cv00927
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Order to Show Cause #8 sent to Kermit Ty Poulson returned as undeliverable. (jn)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that petitioner has 30 days from the date of this Order to inform the Court in writing of his intentions regarding this action. The Court advises petitioner that if he does not file a response to this Order within the time provided, the Court will grant the voluntarily dismissal of this action. Signed on 7/12/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/12/2019.) (joha)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Add Exhibits. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (joha)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to Add Defendants. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (joha)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (joha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson. (sb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner must submit a filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this order. Petitioner's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed on 6/25/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta.(Mailed Order and IFP application to Pro Se party on 6/27/2019.) (dsg)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/12/2019.) (jn)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). (NO IFP, NO FEE PAID) Filed by Kermit Ty Poulson against Captain Alexander, US Government. (jn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poulson v. US Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kermit Ty Poulson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Captain Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?