Navarra v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Elfa Nufable Navarra
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 3:2019cv00931
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Alison Milne Filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Milne, Alison)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance of Joshua S. Press appearing on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Filed by on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Press, Joshua)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance of Alison M. Milne appearing on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Filed by on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Milne, Alison)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on All Defendants Filed by Elfa Nufable Navarra. (Rockenstein, Kiren)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Kenneth T. Cuccinelli. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/12/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/12/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5888640 Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Elfa Nufable Navarra against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons). (Rockenstein, Kiren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Navarra v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Alison M. Milne
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Alison M. Milne
Represented By: Joshua S. Press
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elfa Nufable Navarra
Represented By: Kiren Rockenstein
Represented By: Jimmy W. Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?