Adeyinka v. Barrs et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka
Defendant: Brady Barrs, Ms. Armstong, Texas Department of Justice and C. Aquilera
Case Number: 3:2019cv00943
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #8 . In his motion, plaintiff does not specify how much time he is seeking, but states generally that he intends to travel to Houston, Texas, to obtain documents regarding his parole and sex offender registration. As explained in the Order to Show Cause #7 , plaintiff's allegations against Texas defendants are not properly before this court. However, because plaintiff is a pro se litigant, this court grants an extension until August 15, 2019, for plaintiff to respond to the Order to Show Cause or file an amended complaint curing the defects identified in said order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/1/2019.) (pvh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause #7 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order to Show Cause. Signed on 7/18/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/18/2019.) (pvh)
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 Notice titled "Amendment Claim". Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Exhibits re Complaint #2 . Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/14/2019.) (joha)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka against C. Aquilera, Armstong, Brady Barrs, Texas Department of Justice (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (joha)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adeyinka v. Barrs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Barrs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Armstong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Aquilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel Adewale Adeyinka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?