Northwest Environmental Defense Center v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Defense Center
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00961
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING the parties' joint motion #15 for an extension of time to 10/1/19, for Ross Island to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint, and to extend the deadline for the FRCP 26(f) conference to 10/8/19. (peg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer / Respond to Complaint. Filed by Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.. (Chase, Crystal)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendant's unopposed motion #13 for the extension of time for defendant Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint up to and including 8/2/19. (peg)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.. (Chase, Crystal)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Declaration of Maura C. Fahey of Pre-Suit Notice Letter under Clean Water Act Requirements. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Fahey, Maura)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 Declaration of Emma A. O. Bruden of Service of Complaint Under Clean Water Act Requirements. Filed by Northwest Environmental Defense Center. (Bruden, Emma)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendant's unopposed motion #8 for extension of time from 7/12/19 to 7/26/19 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. (peg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Ross Island Sand & Gravel Company. Filed by Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.. (Chase, Crystal)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.. (Chase, Crystal)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service on Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. served on 6/21/2019 Filed by Northwest Environmental Defense Center. (Bruden, Emma)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul A. Kampmeier for Northwest Environmental Defense Center. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5906717 issued. Signed on 6/27/2019 by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Kampmeier . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5906717. Filed by Northwest Environmental Defense Center. (Bruden, Emma)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ecp)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/18/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/18/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/18/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Northwest Environmental Defense Center. (Bruden, Emma)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5896111 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Northwest Environmental Defense Center against Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Bruden, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northwest Environmental Defense Center v. Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Environmental Defense Center
Represented By: Maura C. Fahey
Represented By: Emma A.O. Bruden
Represented By: Paul A. Kampmeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross Island Sand & Gravel Co.
Represented By: Aaron C. Courtney
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?