Fox v. U.S. Government

Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Fox
Defendant: U.S. Government
Case Number: 3:2019cv00971
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to U.S. Government (Dennis M. Wong, Western Regional Counsel) served on 7/15/2019, answer due on 9/13/2019. Service specifically made upon Other Agency. (ecp)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (sb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to U.S. Government. (Summons, USM 285 form(s), and copies of the Complaint and Order to Proceed in forma pauperis forwarded to the U.S. Marshals Service for service. (re)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Notice #7 to Kenneth A. Fox. (pvh)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's Notice of Mailing ORDER #5 to Kenneth A. Fox, along with blank summoms and USM-285 Form. (pvh)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis #2 . Signed on 6/25/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Kenneth A. Fox regarding Case Assignment Notice #3 . (ecp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (ecp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Kenneth A. Fox. (ecp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Kenneth A. Fox against Kenneth A. Fox (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (ecp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox v. U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth A. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?