Finnochiaro v. OB Portland 1, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Wrather Finnochiaro
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company, OB Portland 1, Inc. and Hanover Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00973
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF REMAND: It is Ordered that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Remand Case to State Court #7 is Granted and this action is Remanded to Multnomah County Circuit Court for all further proceedings. Signed on 7/1/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (gm)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed Motion to Remand to State Court. Filed by Linda Wrather Finnochiaro. (Walgenkim, Young)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Linda Wrather Finnochiaro against All Defendants. (Walgenkim, Young)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/21/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/21/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (joha)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of John R. Barhoum in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Affidavits of Service) (Barhoum, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Barhoum, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV22570 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5899423 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by OB Portland 1, Inc., The Hanover Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Attachment Original Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Barhoum, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finnochiaro v. OB Portland 1, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy J. Frazier
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OB Portland 1, Inc.
Represented By: Tracy J. Frazier
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanover Insurance Company
Represented By: Tracy J. Frazier
Represented By: John R. Barhoum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wrather Finnochiaro
Represented By: Jeremiah Vail Ross
Represented By: Young W. Walgenkim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?