Buero v. Amazon.com Services Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lindsey Buero
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc. and Amazon.com Services Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00974
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 16 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings . Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Defendants. (Crooks, Sarah)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Crooks, Sarah)
June 25, 2019 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Joseph A. Nuccio (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: januccio. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph A. Nuccio for Amazon.com Inc.and Amazon.com Services Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5901094 issued. Signed on 6/25/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Richard G. Rosenblatt (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: rgrosenblatt. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Richard G. Rosenblatt for Amazon.com Inc. and Amazon.com Services Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5901074 issued. Signed on 6/25/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Certificate of Service by All Defendants of Discovery order, #6 , Case Reassignment Notice #7 Filed by All Defendants. (Crooks, Sarah)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Joseph A. Nuccio . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5901094. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Crooks, Sarah)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Richard G. Rosenblatt . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5901074. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (Crooks, Sarah)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/21/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Peter Nickerson in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Crooks, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Shelly M. Erickson in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Crooks, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Joseph A. Nuccio in Support of Defendants Notice of Removal. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2) (Crooks, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Crooks, Sarah)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv22979 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5899458 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Amazon.com Inc., Amazon.com Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet). (Crooks, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buero v. Amazon.com Services Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Inc.
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Joseph A. Nuccio
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc.
Represented By: Sarah J. Crooks
Represented By: Joseph A. Nuccio
Represented By: Richard G. Rosenblatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsey Buero
Represented By: David Arthur Schuck
Represented By: Leslie E. Baze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?