Kistner et al v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Judi Kistner and Ronald Kistner
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC, Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Pfizer, Inc., Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC, 3M Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, A.W. Chesterton Company, General Electric Company, Honeywell International Inc., Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc., C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated, Bryan Steam LLC, Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Officemax Incorporated, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00975
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Referring Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Pfizer Inc.. Filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
August 15, 2019 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance Filed by Pfizer, Inc.. (Alkhazov, Marissa)
August 14, 2019 Filing 34 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Heidi L. Mandt is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Taryn Basauri Filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Mandt, Heidi)
August 6, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance of George S. Pitcher appearing on behalf of C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated along with Jason Daywitt and Elizabeth D. MacGregor Filed by on behalf of C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated. (Pitcher, George)
August 5, 2019 Filing 32 Declaration of Christopher S. Marks . Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #31 .) (Marks, Christopher)
August 5, 2019 Filing 31 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #30 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Marks, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Nelson, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 29 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Peter J. Mintzer is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Adam E. Jones Filed by Bryan Steam LLC. (Mintzer, Peter)
July 22, 2019 Filing 28 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Charles S. Siegel (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: cssiegel. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles S. Siegel for Judi Kistner and Ronald Kistner. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5931318 issued. Signed on 7/22/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (ecp)
July 19, 2019 Filing 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Charles S. Siegel . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5931318. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, James)
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 First Corporate Disclosure Statement Of MetLife. Filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Silk, John)
July 17, 2019 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 17, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of Mark B. Tuvim appearing on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company Filed by on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Tuvim, Mark)
July 12, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance of J. Michael Mattingly appearing on behalf of Officemax Incorporated Filed by on behalf of Officemax Incorporated. (Mattingly, J.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Steele, Katherine)
July 12, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc.. (Manners, Tania)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Eraut, Allen)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Honeywell International Inc.. (Kruger, Kristine)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated. (Steele, Katherine)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Williams, Molly)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance of Molly McKay Williams appearing on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation Filed by on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Williams, Molly)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Marks, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Marks, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Basauri, Taryn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance of Taryn Basauri appearing on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation Filed by on behalf of Parker-Hannifin Corporation. (Basauri, Taryn)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by CBS Corporation. (Marks, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by General Electric Company. (Marks, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by 3M Company. (Hanson, Sandy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by 3M Company. (Hanson, Sandy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR MAR-DUSTRIAL SALES, INC. Filed by Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc.. (Eraut, Allen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/22/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/21/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/21/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sb)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 Declaration of Christopher S. Marks Enclosing State Court File. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court File) (Marks, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Declaration of Christopher S. Marks in Support of Notice of Removal. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - E) (Marks, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 18CV56916 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5899478 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Marks, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kistner et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Erin Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP
Represented By: Rachel T. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Mark B. Tuvim
Represented By: Kevin J. Craig
Represented By: Molly McKay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Marissa A. Alkhazov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Mark B. Tuvim
Represented By: Kevin J. Craig
Represented By: Molly McKay Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Allen E. Eraut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Represented By: Nancy M. Erfle
Represented By: Sandy K. Hanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: John M. Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Erin Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Kristine Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce M. White
Represented By: Allen E. Eraut
Represented By: Tania Manners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.H. Murphy/Clark-Ullman Incorporated
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Megan S. Cook
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Steam LLC
Represented By: Adam E. Jones
Represented By: Peter J. Mintzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker-Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Taryn Basauri
Represented By: Heidi L. Mandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officemax Incorporated
Represented By: J. Michael Mattingly
Represented By: Shaun M. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Megan S. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Rachel T. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Erin Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Erin Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judi Kistner
Represented By: James Gilbert Nelson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Kistner
Represented By: James Gilbert Nelson
Represented By: Charles S. Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?