Hart v. Salazar
Petitioner: Javier Manuel Hart
Respondent: Josias Salazar
Case Number: 3:2019cv00976
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Mandamus and Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Granting Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time #7 . Answer is due by 9/27/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/29/2019.) (ps2)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 . Filed by Josias Salazar. (Potter, Amy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the US Attorney on behalf of Respondent Filed by Josias Salazar. (Potter, Amy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice via e-mail and interoffice mail to U.S. Attorney's Office of Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order #3 and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 . (gw)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241 #1 on respondent. Signed on 7/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment form, #2 Petition) (Mailed to Petitioner on 7/11/2019.) (gw)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 6/24/19.) (dsg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241- Federal) Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected. Receipt No. 84266 issued. Filed by Javier Manuel Hart against Josias Salazar. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hart v. Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Josias Salazar
Represented By: Amy E. Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Javier Manuel Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?