United States Department of Justice v. Dyno Nobel, Inc.
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Defendant: Dyno Nobel, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00984
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Marco A Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Judge Marco A. Hernandez. (eo)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint #1 . Filed by United States Department of Justice. (Phillips, Frederick)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/23/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (sb)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Settlement Agreement /Notice of Lodging. Filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Consent Decree) (Phillips, Frederick)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE against All Defendants. (Phillips, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States Department of Justice v. Dyno Nobel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyno Nobel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Frederick S Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?