Henley et al v. U.S. Bancorp et al
Plaintiff: Jack Dunn, Rose Henley and Orlando Velez
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp d/b/a U.S. Bank National Association (a Minnesota corporation), Nathan Frederick Jones Smith, Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC and U.S. Bancorp
Case Number: 3:2019cv00985
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 Reply Defendants' U.S. Bank National Association Reply in Support to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12 and Memorandum in Support #10 . Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Wagner, Aaron)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 Notice of Joinder to Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC and Nathan Fredrick Jones Smith's Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Removal to Federal Court and Motion for Remand Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Wagner, Aaron)
July 24, 2019 Filing 21 Reply to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6). Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #16 .) (Smith, Nathan)
July 24, 2019 Filing 20 Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Removal to Federal Court and Motion for Remand. Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #15 .) (Smith, Nathan)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 Supplement. Filed by Rose Henley. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #16 .) (sb)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Acosta - Counsel for the defendants have informed the court by email this date, that they believe their currently pending motions to dismiss #7 , #10 are equally applicable to plaintiffs' newly filed amended complaint (ECF #14), filed on 7/16/19. Accordingly, defendants' replies to plaintiffs' combined response to the motions to dismiss will be due on or before 7/30/19.(Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/18/19.) (peg)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Plaintiffs' motion to remand to state court #15 will be taken under advisement by the court as of 8/19/19. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/18/19.) (peg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 16 COMBINED RESPONSE by Plaintiffs to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #7 , #10 . Filed by Jack Dunn, Rose Henley, Orlando Velez. (peg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 OBJECTION to Removal to Federal Court and MOTION TO REMAND to State Court. Filed by Plaintiffs Jack Dunn, Rose Henley, Orlando Velez. (peg) (Main Document 15 replaced on 7/17/2019) (eo).
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Requested: Filed by Plaintiffs Rose Henley, Jack Dunn, Orlando Velez against U.S. Bancorp, Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC and Nathan Frederick Jones Smith.. (peg)
July 10, 2019 Filing 13 Notice re Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 Withdrawal of Oral Argument Request Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #10 .) (Wagner, Aaron)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Defendant US Bancorp's Motion to Dismiss #10 will be taken under advisement as of 8/19/19. Plaintiffs' response to this motion is due no later than 7/19/19. The under advisement deadline for Defendants Nathan Frederick Jones Smith and Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC's Motion to Dismiss #7 is reset to 8/19/19, as well. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/10/19.) (peg)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association. Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Wagner, Aaron)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to FRCP 12 and Memorandum in Support. Oral Argument requested. Filed by U.S. Bancorp. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I) (Wagner, Aaron)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Rose Henley, Orlando Velez, and Jack Dunn regarding Notice of Case Assignment #5 and Order 8 . (joha)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Defendant Law Firm, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith and Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC Corp's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6) #7 will be taken under advisement by the court as of 8/12/2019; Plaintiffs' response to this motion is due no later than 7/17/19. (copy of this order mailed to plaintiffs this date). (peg)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 (b)(6). Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Smith, Nathan)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Certificate of Service by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith of Discovery order, #5 Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Smith, Nathan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/23/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/22/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/22/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 Certificate of Service by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith of Notice #3 , Exhibits, Corporate Disclosure Statement #2 Civil Cover Sheet Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Smith, Nathan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Notice re Notice of Removal, #1 to the United States District Court for the District of Oregon Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Related document(s): Notice of Removal, #1 .) (Smith, Nathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Exhibits , Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith. (Smith, Nathan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV23274 from Oregon Circuit Court, County of Clackamas. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5901155 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC, Nathan Frederick Jones Smith (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Smith, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henley et al v. U.S. Bancorp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Henley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp d/b/a U.S. Bank National Association (a Minnesota corporation)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Frederick Jones Smith
Represented By: Nathan F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm & Cisneros, ALC
Represented By: Nathan F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bancorp
Represented By: Aaron A. Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?