Robinson et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Plaintiff: Dan C Robinson, Nikki N Robinson, Nikki N. Robinson and Dan C. Robinson
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC, Shapiro & Sutherland L.L.C., Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC and Shapiro & Sutherland, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01022
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:2605
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC waiver sent on 7/24/2019. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Knaupp, Benjamin)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of PARTY DISMISSAL by Judge Acosta as to Defendant Shapiro & Sutherland, LLC. per Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of this party (ECF #4), filed 7/9/19. (peg)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Dismissal of Party Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Knaupp, Benjamin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bayview Loan Servicing LLC, Shapiro & Sutherland L.L.C. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 10/28/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 11/25/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 11/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (sb)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5907369 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Nikki N Robinson, Dan C Robinson against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons). (Knaupp, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson et al v. Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Sutherland L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayview Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro & Sutherland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan C Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Knaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki N Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Knaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikki N. Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Knaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan C. Robinson
Represented By: Benjamin D. Knaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?