Roberson Motors, Inc. et al v. Schumacher Electric Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company and Roberson Motors, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc. and Schumacher Electric Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01050
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Property Damage - Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Tuesday, 10/15/2019 at 10:00AM. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent to counsel be separate sealed entry. (peg)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Schumacher Electric Corporation. (Wheeler, Nicholas)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand . Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Wheeler, Nicholas)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Galm, Paul)
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Roberson Motors, Inc.. (Galm, Paul)
July 16, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc.. (Margolis, Wendy)
July 16, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Schumacher Electric Corporation. (Margolis, Wendy)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING defendants' unopposed motion #4 for extension of time to 8/9/19, to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' complaint. Defendant is to note that the corporate disclosure statement is due no later than 7/17/19. (peg)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 Declaration of Wendy M. Margolis in Support of Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition #4 .) (Margolis, Wendy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by All Defendants. (Margolis, Wendy)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 10/31/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/2/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/2/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (jn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court Filed by All Defendants. (Margolis, Wendy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV24199 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5913378 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Amazon.com Services Inc., Schumacher Electric Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet). (Margolis, Wendy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson Motors, Inc. et al v. Schumacher Electric Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul C. Galm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberson Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Paul C. Galm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services Inc.
Represented By: Wendy M. Margolis
Represented By: Nicholas E. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumacher Electric Corporation
Represented By: Wendy M. Margolis
Represented By: Nicholas E. Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?