Gabry v. Lowe's
Plaintiff: Anthony Gerald Gabry
Defendant: Lowe's
Case Number: 3:2019cv01129
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Youlee Yim You
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Filed by Anthony Gerald Gabry. (sb)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order to Show Cause. Signed on 8/2/2019 by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/2/2019.) (pvh)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's Notice of Mailing Case Assignment Notice #3 , Case Reassignment Notice #4 , and Notice to Self-Represented Litigants #7 to Anthony Gabry to address: 12790 SW Ash St. #352, Tigard, OR 97223. (pvh)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice to Self-Represented Litigants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (pvh)
July 29, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Reassignment Notice #4 sent to Anthony Gerald Gabry returned as undeliverable. (sss)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned - Undeliverable: Case Assignment Notice #3 sent to Anthony Gerald Gabry returned as undeliverable. (sss)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/22/19.) (eo)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 7/22/2019.) (sss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Anthony Gerald Gabry against Lowe's (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sss)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Anthony Gerald Gabry. (sss)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabry v. Lowe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gerald Gabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?