Marquez v. Gibson, et al.
Plaintiff: Luis Marquez and Luis Enrique Marquez
Defendant: John Does 1-25 and Joseph Gibson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01130
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING an in-person Rule 16 Conference for Monday, November 4, 2019, at 10:00AM, in Judge Acosta's chambers on the 11th floor of the Mark Hatfield United States Courthouse, 1000 SW Third Avenue, Portland, Oregon 97204. (peg)
August 2, 2019 Filing 3 Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Joseph Gibson. (Buchal, James)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 11/19/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/19/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv24433 from Multnomah County Circuit Court Oregon. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5932716 issued.. Filed by Joseph Gibson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Buchal, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marquez v. Gibson, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Gibson
Represented By: James L. Buchal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Marquez
Represented By: John E. Schlosser
Represented By: Juan C. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Enrique Marquez
Represented By: John E. Schlosser
Represented By: Juan C. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?