Shaffer v. STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.
Plaintiff: Michelle Shaffer
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company, STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD. and Altria Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01188
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.. (Ellis, Joy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #6 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.. (Ellis, Joy)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Altria Group, Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due on 10/9/2018. (Meyer, Robert)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 Acceptance/Acknowledgement of Service of Amended Complaint #6 on STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD. served on 9/16/2019 Filed by Michelle Shaffer. (Meyer, Robert)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Altria Group, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Robert)
September 3, 2019 Filing 6 Amended Complaint . Filed by Michelle Shaffer against STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.. (Meyer, Robert)
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon All Defendants . Return of Service Executed as to Altria Group Distribution Company served on 8/5/2019, answer due on 8/26/2019; STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD. served on 8/5/2019, answer due on 8/26/2019., (Attachments: #1 Attachment) Filed by Michelle Shaffer. (Meyer, Robert) Modified to remove incorrect text and add correct text and deadlines on 8/8/2019 (sss)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 11/29/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/30/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 12/30/2019. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jtj)
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Amended Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Filed by Michelle Shaffer. (Meyer, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5946444 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Michelle Shaffer against STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD. dba Erath and Altria Group Distribution Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons). (Meyer, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaffer v. STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STE. Michelle Wine Estates LTD.
Represented By: Joy Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Shaffer
Represented By: Robert K. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?