Johnson v. Reliable Credit Association Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Charles Johnson
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, Reliable Credit Association, Inc. and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01202
Filed: August 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #13 is GRANTED. The deadline for both Defendants to file an answer to Plaintiff's complaint is extended from 10/03/2019 to 11/04/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (dls)
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Reliable Credit Association, Inc.. (Walsh, Patricia)
September 4, 2019 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Reliable Credit Association, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due on 9/3/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/13/2019, answer due on 9/3/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Defendants Unopposed Motions for Extension of Time to Answer #5 and #9 are GRANTED. The deadline for both Defendants to file an answer to Plaintiffs complaint is extended from 09/03/2019 to 10/03/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley)
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley)
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance of Kimberley Hanks McGair appearing on behalf of Reliable Credit Association, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Reliable Credit Association, Inc.. (McGair, Kimberley)
August 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Reliable Credit Association, Inc.. (Walsh, Patricia)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint, #1 . Filed by Reliable Credit Association, Inc.. (Walsh, Patricia)
August 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Reliable Credit Association, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/3/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/2/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/2/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jn)
August 3, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Filed by David C Johnson. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5949105 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by David C Johnson against Experian Information Solutions Inc, Reliable Credit Association Inc.. (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Reliable Credit Association Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Credit Association, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberley Hanks McGair
Represented By: Patricia A. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Reilley D. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Charles Johnson
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?