Moore v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jo Moore
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2019cv01244
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant Experian's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #13 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 10/17/2019 for Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc. (gm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley)
September 16, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Keating, Reilley)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Defendant Wells Fargo's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time #11 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 10/15/2019 for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (gm)
September 10, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint #1 . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance of Samuel Hernandez appearing on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filed by on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Hernandez, Samuel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 8/27/2019, answer due on 9/17/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 5, 2019 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/27/2019, answer due on 9/17/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons Filed by Kimberly Jo Moore. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/6/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/6/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/6/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (sb)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Filed by Kimberly Jo Moore. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5956468 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kimberly Jo Moore against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Jo Moore
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Samuel Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Reilley D. Keating
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?