Keller v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jill Marie Keller
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC, Selene FInance LP, Limited Partnership and Does 1-100 inclusive
Case Number: 3:2019cv01256
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Brady for TransUnion, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6025667 issued. Signed on 10/3/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Brady . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6025667. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to TransUnion, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due on 10/11/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Defendant Selene Finance LP's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #11 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/18/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Filed by Selene Finance LP, Limited Partnership. (Chase, Crystal)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Jill Marie Keller. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Selene Finance LP, Limited Partnership served on 8/14/2019, answer due on 9/4/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Defendant Selene Finance LP's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #6 ) is GRANTED. Answer is due by 9/18/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer . Filed by Selene Finance LP, Limited Partnership. (Chase, Crystal)
August 13, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Selene Finance LP, Limited Partnership. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael H. Simon and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/11/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/10/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (rs)
August 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons) Filed by Jill Marie Keller. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5958352 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Jill Marie Keller against Selene FInance LP, Limited Partnership, TransUnion, LLC. (Schumacher, Kyle) Modified on 8/13/2019 (rs) to reflect docket entry to include civil cover sheet.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. TransUnion, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene FInance LP, Limited Partnership
Represented By: Crystal S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Marie Keller
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?