Keller v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Riley Joseph Keller
Defendant: Equifax, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, SunTrust Bank, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive and Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01257
Filed: August 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 Answer to #1 Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Equifax, Inc.. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Equifax, Inc.. (Edelson, Jeffrey)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Scott E. Brady for TransUnion, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6025715 issued. Signed on 10/3/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
October 2, 2019 Filing 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott E. Brady . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6025715. Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
October 2, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by TransUnion, LLC. (Henderson, Nicholas)
September 25, 2019 Filing 17 Return of Service Executed as to TransUnion, LLC served on 9/20/2019, answer due on 10/11/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 19, 2019 Filing 16 Return of Service Executed as to Equifax Information Services LLC served on 9/17/2019, answer due on 10/8/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ethan G. Ostroff for SunTrust Bank. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5994095 issued. Signed on 9/10/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 14 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The original application was not in text searchable format and the attachment was missing. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ethan G. Ostroff . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5994095. Filed by SunTrust Bank. (Hernandez, Roman) (Main Document 13 replaced on 9/10/2019) (cw). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2019: #1 Attachment) (cw).
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement SunTrust Bank's Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filed by SunTrust Bank. (Hernandez, Roman)
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 Answer to #1 Complaint SunTrust Bank's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by SunTrust Bank. (Hernandez, Roman)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax Information Services LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 9 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
September 4, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Riley Joseph Keller. (Schumacher, Kyle)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Riley Joseph Keller. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 20, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to SunTrust Bank served on 8/19/2019, answer due on 9/9/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct event (jn).
August 20, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Equifax, Inc. served on 8/14/2019, answer due on 9/4/2019. (Schumacher, Kyle) Modified on 8/21/2019 to correct event (jn).
August 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Equifax, Inc., SunTrust Bank, TransUnion, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/10/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/9/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/9/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (jn)
August 10, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons) Filed by Riley Joseph Keller. (Schumacher, Kyle)
August 10, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5958370 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Riley Joseph Keller against Equifax, Inc., SunTrust Bank, TransUnion, LLC. (Schumacher, Kyle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keller v. Equifax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riley Joseph Keller
Represented By: Kyle W. Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Henderson
Represented By: Scott E. Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Ethan G. Ostroff
Represented By: Roman D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?