Coury v. CBS Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Coury
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., Foster Wheeler, LLC, General Electric Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, CH Murphy/Clark-Ullman, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc. and CBS Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01277
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Imposition of Sanctions . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Melissa Coury. (Mutnick, Jeffrey)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Mutnick in Support of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Remand. Filed by Melissa Coury. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #5 and Reply Memorandum in Support #9 .) (Mutnick, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/7/2019 to add Link to Reply Memorandum (sb).
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Filed by Melissa Coury. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #5 .) (Mutnick, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Christopher S. Marks . Filed by Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Related document(s): Response to Motion #7 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J) (Marks, Christopher)
September 20, 2019 Filing 7 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court #5 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Foster Wheeler, LLC. (Marks, Christopher)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Mutnick in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Filed by Melissa Coury. (Related document(s): Motion to Remand #5 .) (Mutnick, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Melissa Coury. (Mutnick, Jeffrey)
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Morgan, Shaun)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC Filed by Warren Pumps, LLC. (Morgan, Shaun)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 12/13/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (jn)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 16CV06135 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5963207 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Foster Wheeler, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - G, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment Complaint, #4 Attachment Amended Complaint, #5 Attachment Second Amended Complaint). (Marks, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coury v. CBS Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: Erin Fraser
Represented By: Christopher S. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CH Murphy/Clark-Ullman, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine M. Steele
Represented By: Megan S. Cook
Represented By: Elizabeth D. MacGregor
Represented By: George S. Pitcher
Represented By: Jason H. Daywitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Allen E. Eraut
Represented By: Shaun M. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mar-Dustrial Sales, Inc.
Represented By: Claude F. Bosworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Coury
Represented By: Elizabeth Schwartz
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Mutnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?