Fragua v. Peters
Petitioner: Erin Rachelle Fragua
Respondent: Colette S. Peters
Case Number: 3:2019cv01283
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Kristen E. Boyd is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Lynn David Larsen Filed by Colette S. Peters. (Boyd, Kristen)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Scheduling Order upon the State Attorney General on behalf of Colette S. Peters. Filed by Colette S. Peters. (Larsen, Lynn)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Habeas Corpus Scheduling Order Serving Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2254 #1 on respondent. Answer is due by 12/2/2019. Signed on 9/30/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance and Acknowledgment of Service Form, #2 Petition) (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/1/2019.) (joha)
September 26, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 85682 issued. (re)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Erin Rachelle Fragua. Filed by Erin Rachelle Fragua. (sb)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Petitioner did not pay the filing fee or submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that petitioner must submit the $5.00 filing fee or an application to proceed in forma pauperis within 30 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner's failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this action. Signed on 8/21/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Order and Application IFP Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/21/2019.) (joha)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 8/15/2019.) (dsg)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Erin Rachelle Fragua against Colette S. Peters. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fragua v. Peters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Colette S. Peters
Represented By: Lynn David Larsen
Represented By: Kristen E. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Erin Rachelle Fragua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?