Kinsale Insurance Company v. Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC et. al
Plaintiff: Kinsale Insurance Company
Defendant: Leslie Taylor, M.D. Aric Aghayan, Antoinette Smith-Carrasco, Kristin Houston, Northwest Surgical Development Company, Inc., Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC dba Athenix Body Sculpting Institute, James Haefner, Sandra Capusan-Juliano, Carmel Carrasco and Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01286
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to Sandra Capusan-Juliano, Carmel Carrasco, James Haefner, Kristin Houston, Northwest Surgical Development Company, Inc., Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC, Antoinette Smith-Carrasco, Leslie Taylor. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (eo)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to Aric Aghayan. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs) (Main Document 8 replaced on 9/5/2019) (eo).
August 29, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Proposed Summons Filed by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Denton, Aaron)
August 23, 2019 Filing 6 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Matthew J. Hafey (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: mjhafey. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Matthew J. Hafey for Kinsale Insurance Company. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5974994 issued. Signed on 8/23/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew J. Hafey . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5974994. Filed by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Denton, Aaron)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/18/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/17/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/17/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Filed by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Denton, Aaron)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5964728 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kinsale Insurance Company against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet). (Denton, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinsale Insurance Company v. Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC et. al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Aric Aghayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antoinette Smith-Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Houston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Surgical Development Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC dba Athenix Body Sculpting Institute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Haefner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Capusan-Juliano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmel Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Surgical Development of Portland, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinsale Insurance Company
Represented By: Aaron C. Denton
Represented By: Matthew J. Hafey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?