NextWave Marine System, Inc. v. M/V NELIDA et al
Plaintiff: NextWave Marine System, Inc.
Defendant: M/V NELIDA, Gerard Stascausky and Arthur Stascausky
Case Number: 3:2019cv01354
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Scheduling Order by Judge Karin J. Immergut. Telephonic Rule 16 Conference is set for 11/4/2019 at 2:00PM in Portland by telephone before Judge Karin J. Immergut. Before the Conference, at a minimum counsel must conduct real-time conferral by telephone to prepare a proposed case-management schedule to be submitted to the Court prior to the Rule 16 Conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 10/30/2019 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 10/30/2019. (jy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 Answer to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim Against NextWave Marine System, Inc.. Filed by Gerard Stascausky, M/V NELIDA, Arthur Stascausky. (Kampars, Nicholas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 8 Verified Notice Statement of Interest Filed by Gerard Stascausky. (Kampars, Nicholas)
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #6 upon Gerard Stascausky served on 9/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit of Mailing) Filed by NextWave Marine System, Inc.. (Haglund, Michael)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Gerard Stascausky. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons of Gerard Stascausky Filed by NextWave Marine System, Inc.. (Haglund, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by NextWave Marine System, Inc.. (Haglund, Michael)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to M/V NELIDA, Arthur Stascausky, Gerard Stascausky. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sb)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/24/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/23/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/23/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (sb)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5976574 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by NextWave Marine System, Inc. against M/V NELIDA, Arthur Stascausky, Gerard Stascausky (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons M/V NELIDA, #3 Proposed Summons Arthur Stascausky, #4 Proposed Summons Gerard Stascausky). (Haglund, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NextWave Marine System, Inc. v. M/V NELIDA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V NELIDA
Represented By: Nicholas A. Kampars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Stascausky
Represented By: Nicholas A. Kampars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Stascausky
Represented By: Nicholas A. Kampars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NextWave Marine System, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Brickenstein
Represented By: Michael E. Haglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?