Van Der Zanden et al v. Monsanto Company, Inc
Plaintiff: Susie Van Der Zanden and Scott Van Der Zanden
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01382
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Anna J Brown
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Status Report by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Patton, Thomas)
October 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Court directs Plaintiff to file a Status Report no later than 10/25/2019 regarding status of case as Defendant was served on 8/30/19 and no answer has been filed. (bb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Affidavit of Service upon Monsanto Company, Inc served on 8/30/2019 Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Patton, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Monsanto Company, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Filed by Scott Van Der Zanden, Susie Van Der Zanden. (Patton, Thomas)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/27/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/27/2020. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (jn)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5982212 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Scott Van Der Zanden, Susie Van Der Zanden against Monsanto Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Patton, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Der Zanden et al v. Monsanto Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susie Van Der Zanden
Represented By: Thomas C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Van Der Zanden
Represented By: Thomas C. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?