Dossett v. Ho-Chunk, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John Hayden Dossett
Defendant: The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska, Noble Savage Media, L.L.C., Ho-Chunk, Inc. and High Country News
Case Number: 3:2019cv01386
Filed: August 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 30 Motion to Dismiss Motion and Memorandum in Support of Special Motion to Strike and Motion to Dismiss. Oral Argument requested. Filed by High Country News. (Bledsoe, Ryan) Modified on 10/24/2019 (gw).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: Granting Defendant National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #27 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/12/2019. Ordered on 10/24/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 28 Declaration of Scott J. Aldworth in Support of Defendant NCAI's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Appear. Filed by The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time #27 .) (Aldworth, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Filing 27 Motion for Extension of Time to Appear. Filed by The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. (Aldworth, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Filing 26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Chad R. Bowman . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6053487. Filed by The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. (Alterman, Susan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 25 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew E. Kelley . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6053465. Filed by The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. (Alterman, Susan)
October 23, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance of Scott J. Aldworth appearing on behalf of The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska Filed by on behalf of The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. (Aldworth, Scott)
October 23, 2019 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance of Susan T. Alterman appearing on behalf of The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska Filed by on behalf of The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. (Alterman, Susan)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting Defendant Ho-Chunk, Inc.'s Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #21 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 11/4/2019. Ordered on 10/22/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Ho-Chunk, Inc.. (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Granting Defendant Ho-Chunk, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #19 ). Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 10/22/2019. Ordered on 10/15/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (gw)
October 15, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Ho-Chunk, Inc.. (Ducheneaux, Nicole)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Peter M. Meloy (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: pmmeloy. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter M. Meloy for High Country News. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-6017071 issued. Signed on 9/26/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Peter M. Meloy . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6017071. Filed by High Country News. (Bledsoe, Ryan)
September 24, 2019 Filing 15 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Nicole E. Ducheneaux (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: neducheneaux. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nicole E. Ducheneaux for Ho-Chunk, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 09796013739 issued. Signed on 9/24/2019 by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp)
September 24, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Nicole E. Ducheneaux . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 26KDL8Q1 09796013739. Filed by Ho-Chunk, Inc.. (Broadman, Anthony)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ho-Chunk, Inc., Noble Savage Media, L.L.C.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
September 19, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons to Ho-Chunk, Inc. Filed by John Hayden Dossett. (Whipple, B.)
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons to Noble Savage Media L.L.C. Filed by John Hayden Dossett. (Whipple, B.)
August 30, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to High Country News. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued Electronically as to The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically as to Ho-Chunk, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/30/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/27/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 1/27/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (rs)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to High Country News Filed by John Hayden Dossett. (Whipple, B.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska Filed by John Hayden Dossett. (Whipple, B.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Ho-Chunk, Inc. Filed by John Hayden Dossett. (Whipple, B.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint, #1 . Filed by John Hayden Dossett. (Whipple, B.)
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5983106 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by John Hayden Dossett against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E). (Whipple, B.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dossett v. Ho-Chunk, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hayden Dossett
Represented By: Andrew L. Paris
Represented By: B. Scott Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Congress of American Indians of the United States and Alaska
Represented By: Susan T. Alterman
Represented By: Scott J. Aldworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Savage Media, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ho-Chunk, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony S. Broadman
Represented By: Nicole E. Ducheneaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Country News
Represented By: Ryan M. Bledsoe
Represented By: Peter M. Meloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?