Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Vagabond Brewing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc., BMG Rights Management US LLC dba Music of Everpop, Southfield Road Music, Escatawapa Songs, LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Songs Of Universal, Inc., Peppermint Stripe Music and BMG Rights Management US LLC
Defendant: Dean Howes, James Cardwell, Alvin Klausen, Vagabond Brewing LLC d/b/a Victory Club and Vagabond Brewing LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01402
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael W Mosman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT: Defendants' Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint #1 was due on October 16, 2019. Defendants were served on September 25, 2019. No Answer has been filed. I construe Plaintiffs' Motion for Default #14 as a motion for entry of default pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a). I GRANT Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Default. If Defendants make a showing of good cause, the entry of default may be set aside. If no appearance is made, a default judgment may be entered. Signed on 10/28/2019 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment #14 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, 2 and 3) (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 Motion for Default . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Mitchson, Jacqueline) Modified on 10/25/2019 to correct event type to Motion for Default (kms).
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiffs' Substitute Service on Alvin Klausen Return of Service Executed as to Alvin Klausen served on 9/25/2019, answer due on 10/16/2019. (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiffs' Substitute Service on James Cardwell Return of Service Executed as to James Cardwell served on 9/25/2019, answer due on 10/16/2019. (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiffs' Substitute Service on Dean Howes Return of Service Executed as to Dean Howes served on 9/25/2019, answer due on 10/16/2019. (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
September 26, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's Substitute Service on Vagabond Brewing dba Victory Club Return of Service Executed as to Vagabond Brewing LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due on 10/16/2019. (Mitchson, Jacqueline)
September 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (joha)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons - Alvin Klausen Filed by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawapa Songs, LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Peppermint Stripe Music, Songs Of Universal, Inc., Southfield Road Music. (Podwill, Loren)
September 18, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons - James Cardwell Filed by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Escatawapa Songs, LLC, Fake and Jaded Music, Less Than Zero Music, Peppermint Stripe Music, Songs Of Universal, Inc., Southfield Road Music. (Podwill, Loren)
September 18, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons - Dean Howes Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Podwill, Loren)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons - Vagabond Brewing Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Podwill, Loren)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (Mailed to Register of Copyrights on 9/5/2019.) (joha)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Michael W. Mosman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/3/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/3/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (joha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by BMG Rights Management US LLC dba Music of Everpop, Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs Of Universal, Inc.. (Podwill, Loren)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5986630 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Included copyrights: PA 896-254--Inside Out--James Maxwell Stuart Collins; Jonathan Lee Siebels; Anthony Edward Fagenson, PA 797-856; PA 913-999--Semi Charmed Life--Stephan Jenkins; Kevin Cadogan aka Kevin Rene Cadogan; Arion Salazar aka Arion Gabriel Salazar, PAu 2-480-972--Kryptonite--Bradley Kirk Arnold; Robert Todd Harrell; Matthew Darrick Roberts, PA 1-222-338--Seven Nation Army--John Anthony White aka John White aka Jack White. Filed by Songs Of Universal, Inc., Southfield Road Music, Escatawapa Songs, LLC, Less Than Zero Music, Peppermint Stripe Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Fake and Jaded Music, BMG Rights Management US LLC dba Music of Everpop against All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Attachment Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet). (Podwill, Loren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Vagabond Brewing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Broadcast Music, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management US LLC dba Music of Everpop
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southfield Road Music
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Escatawapa Songs, LLC
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fake and Jaded Music
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Less Than Zero Music
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs Of Universal, Inc.
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peppermint Stripe Music
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMG Rights Management US LLC
Represented By: Loren D. Podwill
Represented By: Jacqueline Tokiko Mitchson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Howes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cardwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alvin Klausen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vagabond Brewing LLC d/b/a Victory Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vagabond Brewing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?