Hernandez v. Jefferson County Sheriff's Office et al
Plaintiff: Edward Hernandez
Defendant: Baggett, Inc., Barry Davidson, John Doe I, Jefferson County Sheriff's Office, Oregon State Police Dept., Ron Larson, Jim Adkins, Lee Baggett, Madras City Police Dept., Steve Keever, John Doe II, City of Metolius, Robert Marrazzo, Juan Jose-Cruz Rodriguez and Jefferson County Public Works Dept.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01404
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Motion for Reconsideration of Order #6 . Filed by Edward Hernandez. (joha)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: On September 6, 2019, the Court ordered plaintiff to pay the filing fee by September 20, 2019 and warned plaintiff that failure to pay the fee would result in dismissal of this action. As of October 8, 2019, plaintiff had not paid the filing fee and the Court dismissed the case on that date. On October 11, 2019, plaintiff submitted the filing fee, however the case had previously been dismissed. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to provide plaintiff with a copy of form IRS W-9 to complete and return to the Clerk. Plaintiff may e-mail the completed W-9 form (electronic stamps or /s/ signatures are not accepted) to finance@ord.uscourts.gov or by mail to the Clerk's Office, Attn: Finance Department. Once plaintiff's information is entered into the Court's financial system as a payee, the Clerk shall issue a refund of the filing fee to plaintiff. Signed on 10/17/19 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Attachment : #1 IRS W-9 Form)(Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/17/19.) (gm)
October 11, 2019 Filing fee in amount of $400 collected; Receipt No. 85955 issued. (eo)
October 10, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summonses Filed by Edward Hernandez. (jn)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This action is Dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 10/8/19 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 10/9/19.) (gm)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: A review of Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed IFP #1 reveals he is able to afford the costs of litigation and the application is therefore Denied. Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee within 14 days. Plaintiff is warned that a failure to pay the fee will result in dismissal of this action. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/6/19.) (gm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/4/19.) (sb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Edward Hernandez against Jim Adkins, Lee Baggett, Baggett, Inc., City of Metolius, Barry Davidson, Jefferson County Public Works Dept., Jefferson County Sheriff's Office, John Doe I, John Doe II, Steve Keever, Ron Larson, Madras City Police Dept., Robert Marrazzo, Oregon State Police Dept., Juan Jose-Cruz Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (sb)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Edward Hernandez. (sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Jefferson County Sheriff's Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baggett, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oregon State Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Baggett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madras City Police Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Keever
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Metolius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Marrazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Jose-Cruz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Public Works Dept.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?