Algotek, LLC v. Crinnion
Plaintiff: Algotek, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: David Crinnion
3Rd Party Defendant: Tanner Kalin Rhys Stickling and Justin Karimi Lebuhn
Case Number: 3:2019cv01405
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: John V Acosta
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:102
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 Oral Argument requested. Filed by David Crinnion. (Lusk, Kelly)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, November 20, 2019, at 9:30AM. The court's conference line information will be sent to counsel by separate entry. (peg)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - Motion to Dismiss #13 will be taken under advisement as of 1/15/20; the request for oral argument will be considered in due course. (peg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Tanner Kalin Rhys Stickling, Algotek, LLC, Justin Karimi Lebuhn. (London, Jesse)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - (GRANTING the parties' stipulated motion for protective order #11 .) The Court has reviewed the reasons offered in support of entry of a Stipulated ProtectiveOrder and finds that there is good cause to protect the confidential nature of certain information.Accordingly, the Court adopts the Stipulated Protective Order in this action.IT IS SO ORDERED. DATED this 11th day of October, 2019, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by David Crinnion. (Lusk, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 10 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Tanner Kalin Rhys waiver sent on 9/16/2019. Filed by David Crinnion. (Lusk, Kelly)
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Justin Karimi Lebuhn waiver sent on 9/16/2019. Filed by David Crinnion. (Lusk, Kelly)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Kelly R. Lusk in Support of Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint. Filed by David Crinnion. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint-Notice of Removal,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Placeholder - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2) (Lusk, Kelly)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant David Crinnion's Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) with Jury Demand , Third Party Complaint against Justin Karimi Lebuhn, Tanner Kalin Rhys for Patent Invalidity, Inventorship, and Non-Misappropriation of Trade Secrets, Counterclaim for Patent Invalidity, Inventorship, and Non-Misappropriation of Trade Secrets against Algotek, LLC. Filed by David Crinnion. (Lusk, Kelly)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Acosta - GRANTING Defendant's Unopposed Motion #3 to Seal Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Kelly R. Luskin Support of Crinnions Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint for Patent Invalidity, Inventorship and Non-Misappropriation of Trade Secrets. As there is no current protective order in this case, this document must be submitted to the clerk of the court for filing "conventionally". The clerk will then enter this document under seal into the ECF efiling system. (peg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Kelly R. Lusk in Support of Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Filed by David Crinnion. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #3 .) (Lusk, Kelly)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Filed by David Crinnion. (Lusk, Kelly)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/3/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/3/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/3/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (rs)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19CV35782 from State of Oregon Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Jury Demand: Yes. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5986839 issued. Filed by David Crinnion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Defendant's Draft Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Letter to Counsel, #3 Exhibit C-Acceptance of Service, #4 Exhibit D-State Complaint, #5 Exhibit E-Request for Production, #6 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lusk, Kelly). Modified on 9/5/2019 to include jury demand, yes. (rs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Algotek, LLC v. Crinnion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Algotek, LLC
Represented By: Dominic V. Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: David Crinnion
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Knight
Represented By: Kelly R. Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Tanner Kalin Rhys Stickling
Represented By: Jesse L. London
Represented By: Dominic V. Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Justin Karimi Lebuhn
Represented By: Jesse L. London
Represented By: Dominic V. Paris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?