Schaefer v. Mutchler et al
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Schaefer
Defendant: F.B.I. Agent Craig Mueller, Wade Mutchler, Sgt. Steve Collins and Anthony Schodowski
Case Number: 3:2019cv01449
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Michael H Simon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis (#2 ) is DENIED. Should Plaintiff wish to continue with this case, he must pay the $400.00 civil filing fee within 30 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is advised that failure to submit a filing fee in the amount of $400.00 within 30 days shall result in the dismissal of this action. Signed on 11/2/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/4/2019.) (joha)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Notice. Titled 'Motion Providing Notice of Intent to Alter This Civil Action; Merger.' Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (sb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Declaration of Jason P. Schaefer in Support of Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #3 . Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (sb)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (sb)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/19.) (dsg)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer against Steve Collins, Craig Mueller, Wade Mutchler, Anthony Schodowski. (dsg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaefer v. Mutchler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Paul Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.B.I. Agent Craig Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wade Mutchler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Steve Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Schodowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?