McGee v. Mickley
Petitioner: Menphrey McGee
Respondent: Charles Mickley
Case Number: 3:2019cv01452
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Stacie F Beckerman
Referring Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 Exhibit. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (joha)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 4/8/19.) (eo)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Order. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (dsg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 Memorandum in Support of Dismissal and Default Judgment. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (joha)
September 25, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support of Mandamus and 42 USC 1983. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (joha)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support of Dismissal and Default Judgment. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (kms)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum in Support: Dismissal. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (kms)
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Requesting Extraordinary Remedy. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (kms)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (kms)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/10/2019.) (joha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State). Filed by Menphrey McGee against Charles Mickley. (joha)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Menphrey McGee. (joha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee v. Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Menphrey McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Mickley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?