Radagast Pet Food, Inc. v. Centinela Feed, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Radagast Pet Food, Inc.
Defendant: Centinela Feed, Inc. and Lotus Pet Food, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01467
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Setting a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference for 11/18/2019 at 2:00PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Lotus Pet Food, Inc.. (Postma, Eric)
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint Answer to Complaint following a Notice of Removal (Related Doc. #1 ) . Filed by Centinela Feed, Inc.. (Postma, Eric)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 1/9/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/10/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/10/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jn)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Postma, Eric)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal of Case Number 19cv33707 from Multnomah. Filing Fee in amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5997663 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Centinela Feed, Inc., The Lotus Pet Food, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Acceptance of Service). (Postma, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Radagast Pet Food, Inc. v. Centinela Feed, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centinela Feed, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Postma
Represented By: Nathan B. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotus Pet Food, Inc.
Represented By: Eric S. Postma
Represented By: Nathan B. Pogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radagast Pet Food, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tedesco Milesnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?