Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. v. Enrich Senior Living Management LLC
Plaintiff: Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.
Defendant: Enrich Senior Living Management LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01516
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Jolie A Russo
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: As this case is reported settled, all other case deadlines are Stayed and Plaintiff shall file Final Papers on or before 12/6/2019. (gm)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default #7 . Default is Entered as to Defendant Enrich Senior Living Management LLC. Within 30 days, Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment along with a proposed form of default judgment for review by a U.S. District Judge. (gm)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Declaration of Sean D. O'Brien . Filed by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.. (Related document(s): Request #7 .) (O'Brien, Sean)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 Request to Enter Default of Defendant Enrich Senior Living Management LLC. Filed by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.. (O'Brien, Sean)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.. (O'Brien, Sean)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Enrich Senior Living Management LLC served on 9/25/2019, answer due on 10/16/2019. (O'Brien, Sean)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Enrich Senior Living Management LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (rs)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/21/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/18/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/18/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (rs)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to ENRICH SENIOR LIVING MANAGEMENT LLC Filed by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.. (O'Brien, Sean)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6007175 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included patents/trademarks: 88054566--7/26/2018--Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.. Filed by Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit). (O'Brien, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eclipse Senior Living, Inc. v. Enrich Senior Living Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eclipse Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By: Sean D. O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrich Senior Living Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?