Design Basics, LLC v. Bruinier & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Defendant: Bruiner & Associates, Inc. and Bruinier, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01567
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Oregon
Presiding Judge: Karin J Immergut
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Karin J. Immergut: Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond #16 is GRANTED. Answer is due by 12/27/2019. (jy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint #8 . Filed by Bruinier, Inc.. (Lusk, Kelly)
November 21, 2019 Filing 15 Affidavit of Service upon Bruinier, Inc. served on 10/8/2019 Filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Nokes, Casey)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Sean J. Quinn (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: sjquinn. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sean J. Quinn for Design Basics, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 86300 issued. Signed on 11/12/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
November 12, 2019 Filing 12 Notification of CM/ECF Account for John D. LaDue (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: jdladue. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of John D. LaDue for Design Basics, LLC. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 86299 issued. Signed on 11/12/2019 by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (ecp)
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 First Amended Complaint . Filed by Design Basics, LLC against Bruinier & Associates, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2). (Nokes, Casey)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean J. Quinn. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 86300. Filed by Design Basics, LLC. (ecp)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D. LaDue. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 86299. Filed by Design Basics, LLC. (ecp)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Judge Karin J. Immergut Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #6 . Answer is due by 11/27/2019. (jy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint,,, #1 . Filed by Bruinier & Associates, Inc. (Lusk, Kelly)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report: This report is being submitted pursuant to 17 U.S.C. section 508(a), which states: Within one month after the filing of any action under this title, the clerks of the courts of the United States shall send written notification to the Register of Copyrights setting forth, as far as is shown by the papers filed in the court, the names and addresses of the parties and the title, author, and registration number of each work involved in the action. (jn)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Bruinier & Associates, Inc. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Karin J. Immergut and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 1/29/2020. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/28/2020. Pretrial Order is due by 2/28/2020. Ordered by Judge Karin J. Immergut. (jn)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Design Basics, LLC. (Nokes, Casey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. Copyright Infringement and DMCA Violations (17 U.S.C. 101 et seq. and 17 U.S.C. 1202 et seq. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6021808 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Included copyrights: VA 540-030--Plan No. 2638-Linden--Design Basics, LLC, VA 1-921-734--Plan No. 2638 - Linden--Design Basics, LLC, VA 756-041--Plan No. 1752-Lancaster--Design Basics, LLC, VA 371-204--Plan No. 1752 Lancaster--Design Basics, LLC. Filed by Design Basics, LLC against Bruiner & Associates, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Summons Proposed Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #5 Attachment Copyright Form). (Nokes, Casey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Oregon District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Design Basics, LLC v. Bruinier & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruiner & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruinier, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly R. Lusk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Design Basics, LLC
Represented By: Casey M. Nokes
Represented By: John D. LaDue
Represented By: Sean J. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?